+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 8, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 184'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/08/2020 12:24 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/08/2020 11:12 AM
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 09/24/2020 01:02 PM
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 293 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors, and veterans
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 74 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/29/2019
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Douglas Wozniak