+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 229'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/26/2018 @ 2:42 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/25/2018 @ 1:46 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/27/2018 @ 9:14 AM
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 as amended concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1 as amended
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 446 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1 and amendment(s)
- Rules suspended
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Roll Call # 517 Yeas 98 Nays 11
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic development and international investment
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 503 Yeas 97 Nays 13
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/19/2017
On October 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Workforce and Talent Development
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Daire Rendon
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor