+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 158'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/9/2016 @ 1:46 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/8/2016 @ 2:22 PM
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 5/31/2016 @ 12:06 PM
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 331 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 27 Yeas 105 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 12/10/2015
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jeff Farrington
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor