+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 59'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/27/2014 @ 11:52 AM
- Approved by the Governor 3/26/2014 @ 9:06 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 3/25/2014 @ 2:08 PM
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 129 Yeas 61 Nays 48
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 117 yeas 24 nays 14 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect and full title
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On December 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 458 Yeas 67 Nays 42
- Read a third time
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On November 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 5, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 11/01/2013
On October 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tom Leonard