+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:30 PM
- Assigned PA 490'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/27/2018 @ 4:50 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/24/2018 @ 11:13 AM
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 803 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 424 Yeas 99 Nays 9
- Read a third time
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/17/2017
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Runestad
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor