+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/21/2018 @ 3:28 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/27/2018 @ 4:48 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/24/2018 @ 11:11 AM
- Assigned PA 489'18 with immediate effect
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 885 Yeas 107 Nays 2
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 802 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 423 Yeas 98 Nays 10
- Transmitted
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/17/2017
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Terry Sabo
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor