+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 77'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 3/19/2018 @ 11:47 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/19/2018 @ 1:24 PM
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 3/8/2018 @ 2:22 PM
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 118 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and title amendment
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 116 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 4 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/12/2017
On October 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kim LaSata
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor