+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 113 Yeas 105 Nays 4
- Read a third time
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 23, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 10/23/2013
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Brandon Dillon
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor