+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 50'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 3/1/2018 @ 1:38 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/1/2018 @ 4:20 PM
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 2/20/2018 @ 3:27 PM
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 85 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Amendment(s) adopted
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Inserted full title
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Roll Call # 76 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Title amendment agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and title amendment
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on michigan competitiveness
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 373 Yeas 108 Nays 0
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On October 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/10/2017
On October 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Daire Rendon
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor