+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 38 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/22/2021
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bronna Kahle