+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 252'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/28/2016 @ 11:14 AM
- Approved by the Governor 6/27/2016 @ 12:57 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/21/2016 @ 10:40 AM
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 374 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on agriculture
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 64 Yeas 102 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 5, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 11/05/2015
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Triston Cole
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor