+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned PA 224'13 with immediate effect 2013 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/26/2013 @ 11:24 AM 2013 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/21/2013 @ 6:42 PM 2013 ADDENDA
- Presented to the Governor 12/18/2013 @ 12:52 PM 2013 ADDENDA
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 521 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-3 concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-3 with immediate effect and full title
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 623 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
On November 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-3
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-3
On October 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On October 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 333 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Printed bill filed 10/03/2013
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Charles Brunner
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor