+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 108'22 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 06/23/2022 02:54 PM
- Approved by the Governor 06/23/2022 10:00 AM
On June 9, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/10/2022 11:48 AM
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 293 yeas 32 nays 5 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Discharge committee approved
- Placed on order of general orders
- Reassigned to committee on economic and small business development
On October 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors, and veterans
On October 6, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 457 Yeas 87 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
- Read a third time
On October 5, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/16/2021
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kelly Breen
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor