+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to committee on government operations
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
On November 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on michigan competitiveness
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 368 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
On October 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/28/2017
On September 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Leslie Love
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor