+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 1/5/2015 @ 3:44 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 875 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
On November 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 562 Yeas 106 Nays 0
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 10/02/2013
On October 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ken Goike
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor