+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On September 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/26/2019
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ann Bollin
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor