+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 155'16 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/8/2016 @ 2:38 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/9/2016 @ 1:40 PM
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/2/2016 @ 3:48 PM
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 330 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 304 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on banking and financial institutions
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 463 Yeas 105 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On December 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 10/28/2015
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Services
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Lana Theis
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor