+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 117'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 4/26/2018 @ 11:14 AM
- Approved by the Governor 4/25/2018 @ 5:34 PM
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 4/18/2018 @ 12:46 PM
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 192 yeas 33 nays 2 excused 2 not voting 0
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 13 Yeas 98 Nays 10
- Read a third time
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/26/2017
On September 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Daire Rendon
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor