+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 232'20 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/22/2020 11:26 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/22/2020 12:12 PM
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/16/2020 01:44 PM
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 467 Yeas 101 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 363 yeas 37 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- Title amended
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and title amendment
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to committee on insurance and banking
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 303 Yeas 104 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Transmitted
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/19/2019
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Roger Hauck
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor