+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/27/2016 @ 12:32 PM
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Immediate effect defeated
- Passed roll call # 786 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Reassigned to committee on government operations
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed Roll Call # 613 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-8 adopted and amended
- Substitute H-6 not adopted
- Read a second time
On August 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-6
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 10/14/2015
On October 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Roger Victory
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor