+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 193'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/13/2020 11:30 AM
- Approved by the Governor 10/13/2020 10:02 AM
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 09/29/2020 03:32 PM
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Senate substitute (S-6) concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-6) with immediate effect and title amendment
- Roll call Roll Call # 423 Yeas 93 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Title amendment agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Laid over one day under the rules
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 332 yeas 29 nays 8 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-6) as amended
- Substitute (s-6) as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-6) and amendment(s)
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-5)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-5)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On November 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On November 5, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 305 Yeas 95 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/18/2019
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Eric Leutheuser
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor