+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On October 30, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 356 Yeas 58 Nays 50
- Amended
- Read a third time
On October 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On October 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On September 17, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 09/13/2013
On September 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Al Pscholka
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor