+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 196 Yeas 91 Nays 17
- Read a third time
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 8, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 10/08/2015
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Klint Kesto
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor