+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 193 Yeas 92 Nays 16
- Read a third time
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On October 8, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 10/08/2015
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kurt Heise
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor