+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On December 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-4 not adopted
- Substitute H-6 adopted
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 617 Yeas 59 Nays 50
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On September 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4
On September 3, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 08/28/2013
On August 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kenneth Kurtz
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor