+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 194'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/15/2020 12:00 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/15/2020 09:30 AM
On October 1, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/01/2020 01:04 PM
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
- Roll call Roll Call # 417 Yeas 96 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 324 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 42 Yeas 96 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On September 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/11/2019
On September 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Lynn Afendoulis
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor