+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 269'20
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/29/2020 01:10 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/29/2020 09:20 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 06:21 PM
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 502 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On October 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 68 Yeas 106 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On September 10, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/10/2019
On September 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sarah Anthony
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor