+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 425'14 with immediate effect 2014 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/30/2014 @ 3:34 PM 2014 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2014 @ 11:16 AM 2014 ADDENDA
- Assigned PA 425'14 with immediate effect 2014 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/30/2014 @ 3:34 PM 2014 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2014 @ 11:16 AM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 30, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/23/2014 @ 2:06 PM
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 709 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 820 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 397 Yeas 109 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On August 16, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 08/02/2013
On August 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Walsh
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor