+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 254 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/12/2017
On September 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Trade
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Martin Howrylak
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor