+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor 12/30/2020
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 06:57 PM
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 595 yeas 24 nays 13 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Rep. Sheryl Kennedy removed as cosponsor
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 173 Yeas 67 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 17
- Transmitted
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On September 3, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/03/2019
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sara Cambensy
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor