+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 09/30/2015
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Kivela
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor