+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 133'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 5/3/2018 @ 11:42 AM
- Approved by the Governor 5/2/2018 @ 8:56 PM
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 4/23/2018 @ 12:34 PM
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 203 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 439 Yeas 109 Nays 1
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On September 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/12/2017
On September 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Peter Lucido
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor