+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 22'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 2/23/2016 @ 4:12 PM
- Approved by the Governor 2/23/2016 @ 8:27 AM
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 2/11/2016 @ 2:18 PM
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 35 yeas 27 nays 10 excused 1 not voting 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 419 Yeas 95 Nays 11
- Read a third time
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 10, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 09/10/2015
On September 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Tedder
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor