+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 8, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 89'19 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/07/2019 10:10 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/07/2019 02:58 PM
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/01/2019 04:19 PM
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Rules suspended
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 207 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
- Full title agreed to
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On September 11, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 198 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On September 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
On September 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On August 29, 2019 in the House:
- Per Rule 41 referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Bill electronically reproduced 08/29/2019
On August 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tommy Brann