+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 376'16 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 12/21/2016 @ 7:36 PM
- Presented to the Governor 12/20/2016 @ 11:00 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/22/2016 @ 3:38 PM
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 621 Yeas 101 Nays 6
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 697 yeas 35 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 1
- Inserted full title
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and title amendment
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on agriculture
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 279 Yeas 104 Nays 5
- Read a third time
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation concurred in
- Reported with recommendation for referral to Committee on Agriculture
On September 10, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 09/10/2015
On September 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jason Sheppard