+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 5, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
On September 30, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor 10/03/2021
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
- Rules suspended
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Passed roll call # 361 yeas 21 nays 15 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On September 30, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Presented to the Governor 10/01/2021 03:15 PM
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate effect defeated
On August 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections
On August 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 430 Yeas 77 Nays 31 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Transmitted
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/13/2021
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Phil Green
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor