+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 1, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 173'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/01/2020 12:10 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/01/2020 11:11 AM
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 09/24/2020 12:52 PM
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 308 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 62 Yeas 106 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On August 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 08/29/2019
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
On August 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sarah Lightner
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor