+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned PA 211'13 2013 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/23/2013 @ 4:50 PM 2013 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/21/2013 @ 4:54 PM 2013 ADDENDA
- Presented to the Governor 12/17/2013 @ 2:38 PM 2013 ADDENDA
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 647 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On October 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On October 15, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 324 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On October 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 06/14/2013
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Lisa Lyons