+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 35'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 03/03/2020 03:42 PM
- Approved by the Governor 03/03/2020 12:15 PM
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 02/21/2020 01:14 PM
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 60 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 319 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
On November 5, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Read a second time
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On August 28, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 08/28/2019
On August 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Andrea Schroeder
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor