+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 216'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/26/2018 @ 1:42 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/25/2018 @ 4:30 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/20/2018 @ 1:50 PM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 538 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and title amendment
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 457 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 248 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On August 16, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 07/12/2017
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Christine Greig
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor