+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 370'16
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/22/2016 @ 11:14 AM
- Approved by the Governor 12/21/2016 @ 7:34 PM
- Presented to the Governor 12/20/2016 @ 10:58 AM
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 672 Yeas 107 Nays 0
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s)
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 652 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
On September 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed Roll Call # 170 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On August 19, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 08/19/2015
On August 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Runestad
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor