+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 92'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/26/2018 @ 3:12 PM
- Approved by the Governor 3/26/2048 @ 12:18 PM
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 3/16/2018 @ 10:43 AM
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 153 Yeas 101 Nays 8
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and title amendment
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 141 yeas 35 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
On October 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on agriculture
On October 5, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 292 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On October 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On September 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On August 16, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 07/12/2017
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Roger Victory
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor