+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 28, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 240'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 12/20/2017 @ 1:10 PM
- Presented to the Governor 12/18/2017 @ 11:26 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/21/2017 @ 2:36 PM
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll Call # 511 Yeas 108 Nays 2
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 557 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On November 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 361 Yeas 106 Nays 2
- Read a third time
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/20/2017
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Dan Lauwers
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor