+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On December 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On December 2, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 568 Yeas 95 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
- Read a third time
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on third reading
On November 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/06/2021
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Graham Filler
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor