+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on veterans, military affairs and homeland security
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 830 Yeas 106 Nays 3
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading
- Motion to discharge committee approved
- Rule suspended
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/20/2017
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Holly Hughes
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor