+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 446 Yeas 90 Nays 17
- Read a third time
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/13/2017
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Lilly