+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 104 Yeas 87 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/20/2019
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Outdoor Recreation
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Scott VanSingel