+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 11'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 2/6/2018 @ 1:00 PM
- Approved by the Governor 2/6/2018 @ 10:06 AM
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 1/29/2018 @ 12:15 PM
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 21 yeas 30 nays 7 excused 1 not voting 0
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On October 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 313 Yeas 64 Nays 43
- Read a third time
On October 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-4 adopted
- Substitute H-3 not adopted
- Read a second time
On September 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/08/2017
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Aaron Miller