+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 356 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-4) adopted
- Read a second time
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/27/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Graham Filler