+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 31, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned PA 250'15 with immediate effect 2015 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/22/2015 @ 3:56 PM 2015 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/22/2015 @ 10:34 AM 2015 ADDENDA
- Presented to the Governor 12/21/2015 @ 11:38 AM 2015 ADDENDA
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll Call # 495 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect
On December 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 610 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
On October 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 330 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Substitute H-1 not adopted
- Read a second time
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 06/12/2015
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ed McBroom
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor